Limit your search

1-7 of 7
  1. S.Amdt.1718   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI] (Submitted 06/25/2013)
    Cosponsors: 22
  2. S.Amdt.1714   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] (Submitted 06/25/2013)
    Cosponsors: 9
  3. S.Amdt.1636 to S.Amdt.1183   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] (Submitted 06/24/2013)
    Cosponsors: 3
  4. S.Amdt.1413   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] (Submitted 06/19/2013)
    Cosponsors: 3
  5. S.Amdt.1318   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] (Submitted 06/18/2013)
    Cosponsors: 7
  6. S.Amdt.1312   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] (Submitted 06/17/2013)
    Cosponsors: 7
  7. S.Amdt.1224   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: To clarify the physical present requirements for merit-based immigrant visa applicants.
    Sponsor: Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] (Submitted 06/11/2013) (Proposed 06/19/2013)
    Cosponsors: 2
    Latest Action: 06/27/13 Amendment SA 1224 ruled out of order by the chair.