Limit your search

1-8 of 8
  1. S.Amdt.1668   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Sponsor: Sen. Warner, Mark R. [D-VA] (Submitted 06/25/2013)
  2. S.Amdt.1618 to S.Amdt.1183   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Sponsor: Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] (Submitted 06/24/2013)
  3. S.Amdt.1567 to S.Amdt.1183   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Sponsor: Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] (Submitted 06/24/2013)
  4. S.Amdt.1534   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Sponsor: Sen. Warner, Mark R. [D-VA] (Submitted 06/20/2013)
  5. S.Amdt.1520   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Sponsor: Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] (Submitted 06/20/2013)
  6. S.Amdt.1469   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Sponsor: Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] (Submitted 06/20/2013)
  7. S.Amdt.1253   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Sponsor: Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] (Submitted 06/12/2013)
  8. S.Amdt.1251   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Purpose Requiring Enforcement, Security and safety while Upgrading Lawful Trade and travel Simultaneously (RESULTS).
    Sponsor: Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] (Submitted 06/12/2013) (Proposed 06/19/2013)
    Latest Action: 06/20/13 Motion to table amendment SA 1251 agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 54 - 43. Record Vote Number: 159.