Limit your search

1-16 of 16
  1. S.Amdt.1667   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] (Submitted 06/25/2013)
    Cosponsors: 1
  2. S.Amdt.1636 to S.Amdt.1183   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] (Submitted 06/24/2013)
    Cosponsors: 3
  3. S.Amdt.1557 to S.Amdt.1183   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] (Submitted 06/24/2013)
    Cosponsors: 3
  4. S.Amdt.1438   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] (Submitted 06/20/2013)
    Cosponsors: 0
  5. S.Amdt.1437   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] (Submitted 06/20/2013)
    Cosponsors: 0
  6. S.Amdt.1436   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] (Submitted 06/20/2013)
    Cosponsors: 0
  7. S.Amdt.1435   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] (Submitted 06/20/2013)
    Cosponsors: 0
  8. S.Amdt.1434   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] (Submitted 06/20/2013)
    Cosponsors: 0
  9. S.Amdt.1433   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] (Submitted 06/20/2013)
    Cosponsors: 0
  10. S.Amdt.1432   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] (Submitted 06/20/2013)
    Cosponsors: 0
  11. S.Amdt.1431   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] (Submitted 06/20/2013)
    Cosponsors: 0
  12. S.Amdt.1430   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] (Submitted 06/20/2013)
    Cosponsors: 0
  13. S.Amdt.1429   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] (Submitted 06/20/2013)
    Cosponsors: 2
  14. S.Amdt.1428   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] (Submitted 06/20/2013)
    Cosponsors: 5
  15. S.Amdt.1327   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] (Submitted 06/18/2013)
    Cosponsors: 4
  16. S.Amdt.1278   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] (Submitted 06/13/2013)
    Cosponsors: 2