Limit your search

1-19 of 19
  1. S.Amdt.1679   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Sponsor: Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] (Submitted 06/25/2013)
  2. S.Amdt.1678   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Sponsor: Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] (Submitted 06/25/2013)
  3. S.Amdt.1677   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Sponsor: Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] (Submitted 06/25/2013)
  4. S.Amdt.1676   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Sponsor: Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] (Submitted 06/25/2013)
  5. S.Amdt.1675   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Sponsor: Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] (Submitted 06/25/2013)
  6. S.Amdt.1591 to S.Amdt.1183   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Sponsor: Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] (Submitted 06/24/2013)
  7. S.Amdt.1590 to S.Amdt.1183   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Sponsor: Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] (Submitted 06/24/2013)
  8. S.Amdt.1589 to S.Amdt.1183   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Sponsor: Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] (Submitted 06/24/2013)
  9. S.Amdt.1588 to S.Amdt.1183   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Sponsor: Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] (Submitted 06/24/2013)
  10. S.Amdt.1558 to S.Amdt.1183   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Sponsor: Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] (Submitted 06/24/2013)
  11. S.Amdt.1492   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Sponsor: Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] (Submitted 06/20/2013)
  12. S.Amdt.1481   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Sponsor: Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] (Submitted 06/20/2013)
  13. S.Amdt.1408   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Sponsor: Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] (Submitted 06/19/2013)
  14. S.Amdt.1344   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Sponsor: Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] (Submitted 06/19/2013)
  15. S.Amdt.1331   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Sponsor: Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] (Submitted 06/18/2013)
  16. S.Amdt.1276   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Sponsor: Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] (Submitted 06/13/2013)
  17. S.Amdt.1275   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Sponsor: Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] (Submitted 06/13/2013)
  18. S.Amdt.1274   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Sponsor: Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] (Submitted 06/13/2013)
  19. S.Amdt.1273   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Sponsor: Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] (Submitted 06/13/2013)