Limit your search

1-18 of 18
  1. S.Amdt.1587   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Cruz, Ted [R-TX] (Submitted 06/24/2013)
    Cosponsors: 0
  2. S.Amdt.1586 to S.Amdt.1183   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Cruz, Ted [R-TX] (Submitted 06/24/2013)
    Cosponsors: 0
  3. S.Amdt.1585 to S.Amdt.1183   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Cruz, Ted [R-TX] (Submitted 06/24/2013)
    Cosponsors: 0
  4. S.Amdt.1584 to S.Amdt.1183   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Cruz, Ted [R-TX] (Submitted 06/24/2013)
    Cosponsors: 0
  5. S.Amdt.1583 to S.Amdt.1183   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Cruz, Ted [R-TX] (Submitted 06/24/2013)
    Cosponsors: 0
  6. S.Amdt.1582 to S.Amdt.1183   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Cruz, Ted [R-TX] (Submitted 06/24/2013)
    Cosponsors: 0
  7. S.Amdt.1581 to S.Amdt.1183   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Cruz, Ted [R-TX] (Submitted 06/24/2013)
    Cosponsors: 0
  8. S.Amdt.1580 to S.Amdt.1183   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Cruz, Ted [R-TX] (Submitted 06/24/2013)
    Cosponsors: 2
  9. S.Amdt.1579 to S.Amdt.1183   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Cruz, Ted [R-TX] (Submitted 06/24/2013)
    Cosponsors: 0
  10. S.Amdt.1482   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Cruz, Ted [R-TX] (Submitted 06/20/2013)
    Cosponsors: 0
  11. S.Amdt.1326   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Cruz, Ted [R-TX] (Submitted 06/18/2013)
    Cosponsors: 0
  12. S.Amdt.1325   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Cruz, Ted [R-TX] (Submitted 06/18/2013)
    Cosponsors: 0
  13. S.Amdt.1324   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Cruz, Ted [R-TX] (Submitted 06/18/2013)
    Cosponsors: 0
  14. S.Amdt.1323   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Cruz, Ted [R-TX] (Submitted 06/18/2013)
    Cosponsors: 0
  15. S.Amdt.1322   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Cruz, Ted [R-TX] (Submitted 06/18/2013)
    Cosponsors: 0
  16. S.Amdt.1321   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Cruz, Ted [R-TX] (Submitted 06/18/2013)
    Cosponsors: 0
  17. S.Amdt.1320   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: To replace title I of the bill with specific border security requirements, which shall be met before the Secretary of Homeland Security may process applications for registered immigrant status or blue card status and to avoid Department of Homeland Security budget reductions.
    Sponsor: Sen. Cruz, Ted [R-TX] (Submitted 06/18/2013) (Proposed 06/19/2013)
    Cosponsors: 0
    Latest Action: 06/27/13 Amendment SA 1320 ruled out of order by the chair.
  18. S.Amdt.1295   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Cruz, Ted [R-TX] (Submitted 06/17/2013)
    Cosponsors: 3