Limit your search

1-7 of 7
  1. S.Amdt.1687   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Manchin, Joe, III [D-WV] (Submitted 06/25/2013)
    Cosponsors: 0
  2. S.Amdt.1669   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Manchin, Joe, III [D-WV] (Submitted 06/25/2013)
    Cosponsors: 0
  3. S.Amdt.1268   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: To provide for common sense limitations on salaries for contractor executives and employees involved in border security.
    Sponsor: Sen. Manchin, Joe, III [D-WV] (Submitted 06/13/2013) (Proposed 06/19/2013)
    Cosponsors: 1
    Latest Action: 06/19/13 Amendment SA 1268, under the order of 6/19/2013, having achieved 60 votes in the affirmative, was agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 72 - 26. Record Vote Number: 155.
  4. S.Amdt.1226   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Manchin, Joe, III [D-WV] (Submitted 06/12/2013)
    Cosponsors: 0
  5. S.Amdt.1221   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Manchin, Joe, III [D-WV] (Submitted 06/11/2013)
    Cosponsors: 0
  6. S.Amdt.1220   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Manchin, Joe, III [D-WV] (Submitted 06/11/2013)
    Cosponsors: 0
  7. S.Amdt.1219   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Manchin, Joe, III [D-WV] (Submitted 06/11/2013)
    Cosponsors: 0