Limit your search

1-5 of 5
  1. S.Amdt.1666   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Sponsor: Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] (Submitted 06/25/2013)
  2. S.Amdt.1491   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Sponsor: Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] (Submitted 06/20/2013)
  3. S.Amdt.1459   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Sponsor: Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] (Submitted 06/20/2013)
  4. S.Amdt.1458   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Sponsor: Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] (Submitted 06/20/2013)
  5. S.Amdt.1198   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Purpose To modify the Border Oversight Task Force to include tribal government officials.
    Sponsor: Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] (Submitted 06/11/2013) (Proposed 06/13/2013)
    Latest Action: 06/18/13 Amendment SA 1198, under the order of 6/17/2013, having achieved 60 votes in the affirmative, was agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 94 - 0. Record Vote Number: 153.