Limit your search

1-11 of 11
  1. S.Amdt.1704   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM] (Submitted 06/25/2013)
    Cosponsors: 2
  2. S.Amdt.1694   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM] (Submitted 06/25/2013)
    Cosponsors: 0
  3. S.Amdt.1693   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM] (Submitted 06/25/2013)
    Cosponsors: 1
  4. S.Amdt.1692   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM] (Submitted 06/25/2013)
    Cosponsors: 1
  5. S.Amdt.1691   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM] (Submitted 06/25/2013)
    Cosponsors: 0
  6. S.Amdt.1596 to S.Amdt.1183   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM] (Submitted 06/24/2013)
    Cosponsors: 1
  7. S.Amdt.1595 to S.Amdt.1183   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM] (Submitted 06/24/2013)
    Cosponsors: 1
  8. S.Amdt.1409   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM] (Submitted 06/19/2013)
    Cosponsors: 1
  9. S.Amdt.1242   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM] (Submitted 06/12/2013)
    Cosponsors: 2
  10. S.Amdt.1241   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM] (Submitted 06/12/2013)
    Cosponsors: 1
  11. S.Amdt.1218   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM] (Submitted 06/11/2013)
    Cosponsors: 1