Limit your search

1-10 of 10
  1. S.Amdt.1268   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: To provide for common sense limitations on salaries for contractor executives and employees involved in border security.
    Sponsor: Sen. Manchin, Joe, III [D-WV] (Submitted 06/13/2013) (Proposed 06/19/2013)
    Cosponsors: 1
    Latest Action: 06/19/13 Amendment SA 1268, under the order of 6/19/2013, having achieved 60 votes in the affirmative, was agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 72 - 26. Record Vote Number: 155.
  2. S.Amdt.1251   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: Requiring Enforcement, Security and safety while Upgrading Lawful Trade and travel Simultaneously (RESULTS).
    Sponsor: Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] (Submitted 06/12/2013) (Proposed 06/19/2013)
    Cosponsors: 15
    Latest Action: 06/20/13 Motion to table amendment SA 1251 agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 54 - 43. Record Vote Number: 159.
  3. S.Amdt.1228   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: To prohibit the temporary grant of legal status to, or adjustment to citizenship status of, any individual who is unlawfully present in the United States until the Secretary of Homeland Security certifies that the US-VISIT System (a biometric border check-in and check-out system first required by Congress in 1996) has been fully implemented at every land, sea, and airport of entry and Congress passes a joint resolution, under fast track procedures, stating that such integrated entry and exit data system has been sufficiently implemented.
    Sponsor: Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA] (Submitted 06/12/2013) (Proposed 06/13/2013)
    Cosponsors: 3
    Latest Action: 06/18/13 Amendment SA 1228, under the order of 6/17/2013, not having achieved 60 votes in the affirmative, was not agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 36 - 58. Record Vote Number: 152.
  4. S.Amdt.1227   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: To include a representative from the Southwestern State of Nevada on the Southern Border Security Commission.
    Sponsor: Sen. Heller, Dean [R-NV] (Submitted 06/12/2013) (Proposed 06/19/2013)
    Cosponsors: 1
    Latest Action: 06/19/13 Amendment SA 1227, under the order of 6/19/2013, having achieved 60 votes in the affirmative, was agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 89 - 9. Record Vote Number: 157.
  5. S.Amdt.1208   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: To require fast-track congressional approval when the Secretary of Homeland Security notifies Congress of the implementation of the border security strategies and certifies that the strategies are substantially operational.
    Sponsor: Sen. Lee, Mike [R-UT] (Submitted 06/11/2013) (Proposed 06/19/2013)
    Cosponsors: 2
    Latest Action: 06/19/13 Amendment SA 1208, under the order of 6/19/2013, not having achieved 60 votes in the affirmative, was not agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 39 - 59. Record Vote Number: 156.
  6. S.Amdt.1200   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: To provide for enhanced border security, including strong border security metrics and congressional votes on border security and for other purposes.
    Sponsor: Sen. Paul, Rand [R-KY] (Submitted 06/11/2013) (Proposed 06/19/2013)
    Cosponsors: 1
    Latest Action: 06/19/13 Motion to table amendment SA 1200 agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 61 - 37. Record Vote Number: 154.
  7. S.Amdt.1198   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: To modify the Border Oversight Task Force to include tribal government officials.
    Sponsor: Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] (Submitted 06/11/2013) (Proposed 06/13/2013)
    Cosponsors: 5
    Latest Action: 06/18/13 Amendment SA 1198, under the order of 6/17/2013, having achieved 60 votes in the affirmative, was agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 94 - 0. Record Vote Number: 153.
  8. S.Amdt.1197   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: To require the completion of the 350 miles of reinforced, double-layered fencing described in section 102(b)(1)(A) of the Illegal Immigration Reform and Immigrant Responsibility Act of 1996 before registered provisional immigrant status may be granted and to require the completion of 700 miles of such fencing before the status of registered provisional immigrants may be adjusted to permanent resident status.
    Sponsor: Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] (Submitted 06/11/2013) (Proposed 06/13/2013)
    Cosponsors: 2
    Latest Action: 06/18/13 Amendment SA 1197, under the order of 6/17/2013, not having achieved 60 votes in the affirmative, was not agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 39 - 54. Record Vote Number: 151.
  9. S.Amdt.1195   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: To prohibit the granting of registered provisional immigrant status until the Secretary has maintained effective control of the borders for 6 months.
    Sponsor: Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] (Submitted 06/11/2013) (Proposed 06/11/2013)
    Cosponsors: 2
    Latest Action: 06/13/13 Motion to table amendment SA 1195 agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 57 - 43. Record Vote Number: 148.
  10. S.Amdt.1183   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: To strengthen border security and enforcement.
    Sponsor: Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] (Submitted 06/11/2013) (Proposed 06/11/2013)
    Cosponsors: 16
    Latest Action: 06/26/13 Amendment SA 1183 as modified agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 69 - 29. Record Vote Number: 163. (consideration: CR S5215)