Limit your search

1-7 of 7
  • S.Amdt.1298   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: To promote recruitment of former members of the Armed Forces and members of the reserve components of the Armed Forces to serve in United States Customs and Border Protection and United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement.
    Sponsor: Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] (Submitted 06/17/2013) (Proposed 06/19/2013)
    Cosponsors: 1
    Latest Action: 06/19/13 Amendment SA 1298 agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote.
  • S.Amdt.1268   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: To provide for common sense limitations on salaries for contractor executives and employees involved in border security.
    Sponsor: Sen. Manchin, Joe, III [D-WV] (Submitted 06/13/2013) (Proposed 06/19/2013)
    Cosponsors: 1
    Latest Action: 06/19/13 Amendment SA 1268, under the order of 6/19/2013, having achieved 60 votes in the affirmative, was agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 72 - 26. Record Vote Number: 155.
  • S.Amdt.1237   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: To increase the employment of Americans by requiring State workforce agencies to certify that employers are actively recruiting Americans and that Americans are not qualified or available to fill the positions that the employer seeks to fill with H-2B nonimmigrants.
    Sponsor: Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] (Submitted 06/12/2013) (Proposed 06/19/2013)
    Cosponsors: 1
    Latest Action: 06/19/13 Amendment SA 1237 as modified agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote. (text as modified: CR S4653)
  • S.Amdt.1227   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: To include a representative from the Southwestern State of Nevada on the Southern Border Security Commission.
    Sponsor: Sen. Heller, Dean [R-NV] (Submitted 06/12/2013) (Proposed 06/19/2013)
    Cosponsors: 1
    Latest Action: 06/19/13 Amendment SA 1227, under the order of 6/19/2013, having achieved 60 votes in the affirmative, was agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 89 - 9. Record Vote Number: 157.
  • S.Amdt.1222   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: To apply the amendments made by the Child Citizenship Act of 2000 retroactively to all individuals adopted by a citizen of the United States in an international adoption and to repeal the pre-adoption parental visitation requirement for automatic citizenship and to amend section 320 of the Immigration and Nationality Act relating to automatic citizenship for children born outside of the United States who have a United States citizen parent.
    Sponsor: Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] (Submitted 06/11/2013) (Proposed 06/13/2013)
    Cosponsors: 3
    Latest Action: 06/18/13 Amendment SA 1222 agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote.
  • S.Amdt.1198   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: To modify the Border Oversight Task Force to include tribal government officials.
    Sponsor: Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] (Submitted 06/11/2013) (Proposed 06/13/2013)
    Cosponsors: 5
    Latest Action: 06/18/13 Amendment SA 1198, under the order of 6/17/2013, having achieved 60 votes in the affirmative, was agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 94 - 0. Record Vote Number: 153.
  • S.Amdt.1183   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: To strengthen border security and enforcement.
    Sponsor: Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] (Submitted 06/11/2013) (Proposed 06/11/2013)
    Cosponsors: 16
    Latest Action: 06/26/13 Amendment SA 1183 as modified agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 69 - 29. Record Vote Number: 163. (consideration: CR S5215)