Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX]* 04/17/2013
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI]* 04/17/2013
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID]* 04/17/2013
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ]* 04/17/2013
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH]* 04/17/2013
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK]* 04/17/2013
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 04/17/2013
Sen. Hagan, Kay [D-NC]* 04/17/2013
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK]* 04/17/2013
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN]* 04/17/2013
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID]* 04/17/2013
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA]* 04/17/2013
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS]* 04/17/2013
Sen. Heller, Dean [R-NV] 04/24/2013
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 04/25/2013
Sen. King, Angus S. Jr. [I-ME] 05/22/2013
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 06/03/2013
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 06/10/2013
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 06/20/2013
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 09/17/2013
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO] 10/15/2013
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 12/09/2013