Text: S.753 — 113th Congress (2013-2014)All Information (Except Text)

Text available as:

Shown Here:
Reported to Senate (05/14/2014)

 
[Congressional Bills 113th Congress]
[From the U.S. Government Publishing Office]
[S. 753 Reported in Senate (RS)]

                                                       Calendar No. 376
113th CONGRESS
  2d Session
                                 S. 753

                          [Report No. 113-159]

To provide for national security benefits for White Sands Missile Range 
                            and Fort Bliss.


_______________________________________________________________________


                   IN THE SENATE OF THE UNITED STATES

                             April 17, 2013

  Mr. Heinrich (for himself, Mr. Udall of New Mexico, and Mr. Cornyn) 
introduced the following bill; which was read twice and referred to the 
               Committee on Energy and Natural Resources

                              May 14, 2014

              Reported by Ms. Landrieu, with an amendment
  [Omit the part struck through and insert the part printed in italic]

_______________________________________________________________________

                                 A BILL


 
To provide for national security benefits for White Sands Missile Range 
                            and Fort Bliss.

    Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives of the 
United States of America in Congress assembled,

SECTION 1. WHITE SANDS MISSILE RANGE AND FORT BLISS.

    (a) Withdrawal.--
            (1) In general.--Subject to valid existing rights and 
        paragraph (3), the Federal land described in paragraph (2) is 
        withdrawn from--
                    (A) entry, appropriation, and disposal under the 
                public land laws;
                    (B) location, entry, and patent under the mining 
                laws; and
                    (C) operation of the mineral leasing, mineral 
                materials, and geothermal leasing laws.
            (2) Description of federal land.--The Federal land referred 
        to in paragraph (1) consists of--
                    (A) the approximately 5,100 acres of land depicted 
                as ``Parcel 1'' on the map entitled ``White Sands 
                Missile Range/Fort Bliss/BLM Land Transfer and 
                Withdrawal'' and dated April 3, 2012 (referred to in 
                this section as the ``map'');
                    (B) the approximately 37,600 acres of land depicted 
                as ``Parcel 2'', ``Parcel 3'', and ``Parcel 4'' on the 
                map; and
                    (C) any land or interest in land that is acquired 
                by the United States within the boundaries of the 
                parcels described in subparagraph (B).
            (3) Limitation.--Notwithstanding paragraph (1), the land 
        depicted as ``Parcel 4'' on the map is not withdrawn for 
        purposes of the issuance of oil and gas pipeline rights-of-way.
    (b) Reservation.--The Federal land described in subsection 
(a)(2)(A) is reserved for use by the Secretary of the Army for military 
purposes in accordance with Public Land Order 833, dated May 21, 1952 
(17 Fed. Reg. 4822).
<DELETED>    (c) Transfer of Administrative Jurisdiction.--Effective on 
the date of enactment of this Act, administrative jurisdiction over the 
approximately 2,050 acres of land generally depicted as ``Parcel 2'' on 
the map--</DELETED>
        <DELETED>    (1) is transferred from the Secretary of the Army 
        to the Secretary of the Interior (acting through the Director 
        of the Bureau of Land Management); and</DELETED>
        <DELETED>    (2) shall be managed in accordance with--
        </DELETED>
                <DELETED>    (A) the Federal Land Policy and Management 
                Act of 1976 (43 U.S.C. 1701 et seq.); and</DELETED>
                <DELETED>    (B) any other applicable laws.</DELETED>
    (c) Revocation of Withdrawal; Management.--Effective on the date of 
enactment of this Act--
            (1) Public Land Order 833, dated May 21, 1952 (17 Fed. Reg. 
        4822), is revoked with respect to the approximately 2,050 acres 
        of land generally depicted as ``Parcel 2'' on the map; and
            (2) the land described in paragraph (1) shall be managed by 
        the Secretary of the Interior as public land, in accordance 
        with--
                    (A) the Federal Land Policy and Management Act of 
                1976 (43 U.S.C. 1701 et seq.); and
                    (B) any other applicable laws.
    (d) Legal Description.--
            (1) In general.--As soon as practicable after the date of 
        enactment of this Act, the Secretary of the Interior shall 
        publish in the Federal Register a legal description of the 
        Federal land withdrawn by subsection (a).
            (2) Force of law.--The legal description published under 
        paragraph (1) shall have the same force and effect as if 
        included in this Act, except that the Secretary of the Interior 
        may correct errors in the legal description.
            (3) Reimbursement of costs.--The Secretary of the Army 
        shall reimburse the Secretary of the Interior for any costs 
        incurred by the Secretary of the Interior in implementing this 
        subsection with regard to the Federal land described in 
        subsection (a)(2)(A).
                                                       Calendar No. 376

113th CONGRESS

  2d Session

                                 S. 753

                          [Report No. 113-159]

_______________________________________________________________________

                                 A BILL

To provide for national security benefits for White Sands Missile Range 
                            and Fort Bliss.

_______________________________________________________________________

                              May 14, 2014

                       Reported with an amendment