Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL]* 04/18/2013
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA]* 04/18/2013
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT]* 04/18/2013
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA]* 04/18/2013
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA]* 04/18/2013
Sen. Manchin, Joe, III [D-WV] 05/07/2013
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 05/21/2013
Sen. Heller, Dean [R-NV] 06/17/2013
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 06/20/2013
Sen. Toomey, Pat [R-PA] 06/27/2013
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 09/24/2013
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC] 11/21/2013
Sen. Schatz, Brian [D-HI] 03/13/2014
Sen. Walsh, John E. [D-MT] 04/11/2014
Sen. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI] 05/13/2014
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS] 12/02/2014