Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Johanns, Mike [R-NE]* 04/22/2013
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 10/09/2013
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 12/18/2013
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 03/11/2014
Sen. Warren, Elizabeth [D-MA] 03/12/2014