Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK]* 04/23/2013
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT]* 04/23/2013
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA]* 04/23/2013
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL]* 04/23/2013
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN]* 04/23/2013
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA]* 04/23/2013
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ]* 04/23/2013
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR]* 04/23/2013
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA]* 04/23/2013
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT]* 04/23/2013
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH]* 04/23/2013
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI]* 04/23/2013
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR]* 04/23/2013
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE] 04/24/2013
Sen. King, Angus S. Jr. [I-ME] 05/06/2013
Sen. Schatz, Brian [D-HI] 05/07/2013
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 05/07/2013
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 05/13/2013
Sen. Warren, Elizabeth [D-MA] 05/23/2013
Sen. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI] 06/11/2013