Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK]* 04/23/2013
Sen. King, Angus S. Jr. [I-ME] 04/25/2013
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 05/13/2013
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] 05/15/2013
Sen. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ] 05/15/2013
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID] 05/20/2013
Sen. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM] 06/03/2013
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 06/04/2013
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 06/18/2013
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 06/27/2013
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 07/09/2013
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 07/11/2013
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 07/29/2013
Sen. Hagan, Kay [D-NC] 08/01/2013
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 09/09/2013