There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to grant the Congressional Gold Medal, collectively, to the First Special Service Force, in recognition of its superior service during World War II.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
04/23/2013Introduced in Senate

All Actions (1)

Date All Actions
04/23/2013Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (72)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK]* 04/23/2013
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC]* 04/23/2013
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT]* 04/23/2013
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 04/25/2013
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 04/25/2013
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 05/06/2013
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] 05/06/2013
Sen. Hagan, Kay R. [D-NC] 05/06/2013
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 05/06/2013
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 05/06/2013
Sen. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI] 05/08/2013
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 05/08/2013
Sen. Manchin, Joe, III [D-WV] 05/09/2013
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS] 05/13/2013
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 05/13/2013
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 05/13/2013
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 05/13/2013
Sen. Johanns, Mike [R-NE] 05/14/2013
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 05/14/2013
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 05/14/2013
Sen. Warren, Elizabeth [D-MA] 05/15/2013
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 05/15/2013
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA] 05/15/2013
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 05/16/2013
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 05/16/2013
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 05/16/2013
Sen. Toomey, Pat [R-PA] 05/20/2013
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 05/20/2013
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 05/20/2013
Sen. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI] 05/22/2013
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 05/22/2013
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 05/22/2013
Sen. Murphy, Christopher [D-CT] 05/22/2013
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 05/22/2013
Sen. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN] 05/23/2013
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 05/23/2013
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO] 05/23/2013
Sen. Heitkamp, Heidi [D-ND] 05/23/2013
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 05/23/2013
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR] 06/03/2013
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 06/04/2013
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 06/07/2013
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY] 06/11/2013
Sen. Corker, Bob [R-TN] 06/13/2013
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN] 06/13/2013
Sen. Hoeven, John [R-ND] 06/13/2013
Sen. Portman, Rob [R-OH] 06/17/2013
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 06/19/2013
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL] 06/20/2013
Sen. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL] 06/20/2013
Sen. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ] 06/25/2013
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC] 06/25/2013
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 06/25/2013
Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] 06/25/2013
Sen. Durbin, Richard J. [D-IL] 06/25/2013
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 06/26/2013
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 06/26/2013
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 06/26/2013
Sen. Ayotte, Kelly [R-NH] 06/26/2013
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 06/26/2013
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 06/26/2013
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 06/26/2013
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN] 06/26/2013
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 06/26/2013
Sen. Kaine, Tim [D-VA] 06/26/2013
Sen. King, Angus S., Jr. [I-ME] 06/26/2013
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 06/26/2013
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 06/26/2013
Sen. Schatz, Brian [D-HI] 06/26/2013
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 06/26/2013
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 06/26/2013
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 06/27/2013

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs04/23/2013 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.789. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (04/23/2013)

Requires the Speaker of the House of Representatives and the President pro tempore of the Senate to make appropriate arrangements for the award, on behalf of Congress, of a gold medal to the First Special Service Force (a joint American-Canadian volunteer unit), collectively, in recognition of their World War II service.

Requires the awarded medal to be given to the First Special Service Force Association in Helena, Montana, for display or temporary loan for display elsewhere, including at Fort William Henry Harrison in Helena.

Authorizes the Secretary of the Treasury to strike and sell bronze duplicates with proceeds deposited in the U.S. Mint Public Enterprise Fund.

Declares that medals struck under this Act are national medals for purposes of specified coins and currency provisions.