Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK]* 04/23/2013
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC]* 04/23/2013
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT]* 04/23/2013
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 04/25/2013
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 04/25/2013
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 05/06/2013
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] 05/06/2013
Sen. Hagan, Kay [D-NC] 05/06/2013
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 05/06/2013
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 05/06/2013
Sen. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI] 05/08/2013
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 05/08/2013
Sen. Manchin, Joe, III [D-WV] 05/09/2013
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS] 05/13/2013
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 05/13/2013
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 05/13/2013
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 05/13/2013
Sen. Johanns, Mike [R-NE] 05/14/2013
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 05/14/2013
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 05/14/2013
Sen. Warren, Elizabeth [D-MA] 05/15/2013
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 05/15/2013
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA] 05/15/2013
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 05/16/2013
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 05/16/2013
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 05/16/2013
Sen. Toomey, Pat [R-PA] 05/20/2013
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 05/20/2013
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 05/20/2013
Sen. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI] 05/22/2013
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 05/22/2013
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 05/22/2013
Sen. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT] 05/22/2013
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 05/22/2013
Sen. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN] 05/23/2013
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 05/23/2013
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO] 05/23/2013
Sen. Heitkamp, Heidi [D-ND] 05/23/2013
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 05/23/2013
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR] 06/03/2013
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 06/04/2013
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 06/07/2013
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY] 06/11/2013
Sen. Corker, Bob [R-TN] 06/13/2013
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN] 06/13/2013
Sen. Hoeven, John [R-ND] 06/13/2013
Sen. Portman, Rob [R-OH] 06/17/2013
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 06/19/2013
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL] 06/20/2013
Sen. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL] 06/20/2013
Sen. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ] 06/25/2013
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC] 06/25/2013
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 06/25/2013
Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] 06/25/2013
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 06/25/2013
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 06/26/2013
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 06/26/2013
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 06/26/2013
Sen. Ayotte, Kelly [R-NH] 06/26/2013
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 06/26/2013
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 06/26/2013
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 06/26/2013
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN] 06/26/2013
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 06/26/2013
Sen. Kaine, Tim [D-VA] 06/26/2013
Sen. King, Angus S. Jr. [I-ME] 06/26/2013
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 06/26/2013
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 06/26/2013
Sen. Schatz, Brian [D-HI] 06/26/2013
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 06/26/2013
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 06/26/2013
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 06/27/2013