Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Portman, Rob [R-OH]* 04/23/2013
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN]* 04/23/2013
Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK]* 04/23/2013
Sen. Toomey, Pat [R-PA]* 04/23/2013
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA]* 04/23/2013
Sen. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ]* 04/23/2013
Sen. Lee, Mike [R-UT]* 04/23/2013
Sen. Johnson, Ron [R-WI]* 04/23/2013
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 04/24/2013
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID] 04/24/2013
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 04/24/2013
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC] 04/24/2013
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN] 04/24/2013
Sen. Fischer, Deb [R-NE] 04/24/2013
Sen. Hoeven, John [R-ND] 04/24/2013
Sen. Corker, Bob [R-TN] 04/25/2013
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 04/25/2013
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 05/07/2013
Sen. Hagan, Kay [D-NC] 07/30/2013