Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK]* 04/24/2013
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY]* 04/24/2013
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT]* 04/24/2013
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK]* 04/24/2013
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT]* 04/24/2013
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT]* 04/24/2013
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR]* 04/24/2013
Sen. Schatz, Brian [D-HI]* 04/24/2013
Sen. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM]* 04/24/2013
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 05/07/2013
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 05/21/2013
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 07/31/2013
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 07/31/2013
Sen. Warren, Elizabeth [D-MA] 11/04/2013
Sen. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT] 01/13/2014
Sen. Booker, Cory A. [D-NJ] 07/31/2014
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 09/16/2014