Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI]* 04/25/2013
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 04/25/2013
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 05/15/2013
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 05/23/2013
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 06/04/2013
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 06/06/2013
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 06/24/2013
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 09/12/2013
Sen. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA] 09/23/2013
Sen. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM] 09/24/2013
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 09/24/2013
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 10/29/2013
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 10/29/2013
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] 10/29/2013
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 10/29/2013
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 12/16/2013
Sen. Booker, Cory A. [D-NJ] 09/18/2014