Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH]* 04/25/2013
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK]* 04/25/2013
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT]* 04/25/2013
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH]* 04/25/2013
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ]* 04/25/2013
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 04/25/2013
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR]* 04/25/2013
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM]* 04/25/2013
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 06/17/2013
Sen. Warren, Elizabeth [D-MA] 06/20/2013
Sen. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA] 01/08/2014
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 03/12/2014