There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Introduced

Homeless Veterans Prevention Act of 2013

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to amend title 38, United States Code, to improve the provision of services for homeless veterans, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
04/25/2013Introduced in Senate

All Actions (3)

Date All Actions
05/09/2013Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Hearings held. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 113-203.
04/25/2013Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. (text of measure as introduced: CR S3037-3038)
Action By: Senate
04/25/2013Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S3036)
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (5)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC]* 04/25/2013
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 05/23/2013
Sen. Murphy, Christopher [D-CT] 07/10/2013
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] 07/16/2013
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 11/07/2013

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
Senate Veterans' Affairs04/25/2013 Referred to
05/09/2013 Hearings by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.825. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (04/25/2013)

Homeless Veterans Prevention Act of 2013 - Requires public or private nonprofit entities that receive grants under the Department of Veterans Affairs (VA) comprehensive service programs for homeless veterans to agree to meet the physical, privacy, safety, and security needs of such veterans.

Increases the per diem payment for transitional housing assistance for homeless veterans who are placed in housing that will become permanent upon the termination of such assistance to a maximum of 150% of the per diem rate authorized for veterans receiving domiciliary care in state homes.

Allows services for which a homeless veteran receives a grant under the comprehensive service programs to include furnishing care for a dependent.

Directs the Secretary of Veterans Affairs (Secretary) to: (1) assess and measure the capacity of programs for which entities receive grants or per diem payments to assist homeless veterans, and (2) use such information to ensure that such programs effectively serve the needs of such veterans. Repeals a required annual VA report on activities under such programs.

Repeals the September 30, 2013, sunset on the authority of the Secretary and the Secretary of Labor to carry out a program of referral and counseling for veterans who are at risk of homelessness and are transitioning from certain institutions, including penal institutions.

Authorizes the Secretary to enter into partnerships with public or private entities to provide legal services to homeless veterans and veterans at risk of homelessness.

Revises VA authority to provide dental care to veterans receiving certain other assistance through the VA to include those veterans receiving assistance under the United States Housing Act of 1937.

Extends permanently the VA comprehensive service programs for homeless veterans. Extends temporarily various VA authorities and programs affecting homeless veterans.