Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC]* 04/25/2013
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 05/23/2013
Sen. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT] 07/10/2013
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] 07/16/2013
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 11/07/2013