Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL]* 04/25/2013
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 04/25/2013
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT]* 04/25/2013
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV]* 04/25/2013
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR]* 04/25/2013
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI]* 04/25/2013
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ]* 04/25/2013
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD]* 04/25/2013
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA]* 04/25/2013
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA]* 04/25/2013
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ]* 04/25/2013
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY]* 04/25/2013
Sen. Cowan, William M. [D-MA]* 04/25/2013
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI]* 04/25/2013
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI]* 04/25/2013
Sen. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI]* 04/25/2013
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA]* 04/25/2013
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI]* 04/25/2013
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA]* 04/25/2013
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT]* 04/25/2013
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK]* 04/25/2013
Sen. Schatz, Brian [D-HI]* 04/25/2013
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN]* 04/25/2013
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN]* 04/25/2013
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO]* 04/25/2013
Sen. Warren, Elizabeth [D-MA]* 04/25/2013
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD]* 04/25/2013
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR]* 04/25/2013
Sen. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT]* 04/25/2013
Sen. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI] 07/23/2013
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE] 07/23/2013
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 07/23/2013
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 03/06/2014
Sen. Booker, Cory A. [D-NJ] 03/06/2014
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 06/26/2014
Sen. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM] 07/24/2014