There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Jump to: Summary | Actions Overview | All Actions | Titles | Subjects | Cosponsors | Committees | Related Bills

Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.84. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (01/23/2013)

Paycheck Fairness Act - Amends the portion of the Fair Labor Standards Act of 1938 (FLSA) known as the Equal Pay Act to revise remedies for, enforcement of, and exceptions to prohibitions against sex discrimination in the payment of wages.

Revises the exception to the prohibition for a wage rate differential based on any other factor other than sex. Limits such factors to bona fide factors, such as education, training, or experience.

States that the bona fide factor defense shall apply only if the employer demonstrates that such factor: (1) is not based upon or derived from a sex-based differential in compensation, (2) is job-related with respect to the position in question, and (3) is consistent with business necessity. Makes such defense inapplicable where the employee demonstrates that: (1) an alternative employment practice exists that would serve the same business purpose without producing such differential, and (2) the employer has refused to adopt such alternative practice.

Revises the prohibition against employer retaliation for employee complaints. Prohibits retaliation for inquiring about, discussing, or disclosing the wages of the employee or another employee in response to a complaint or charge, or in furtherance of a sex discrimination investigation, proceeding, hearing, or action, or an investigation conducted by the employer.

Makes employers who violate sex discrimination prohibitions liable in a civil action for either compensatory or (except for the federal government) punitive damages.

States that any action brought to enforce the prohibition against sex discrimination may be maintained as a class action in which individuals may be joined as party plaintiffs without their written consent.

Authorizes the Secretary of Labor (Secretary) to seek additional compensatory or punitive damages in a sex discrimination action.

Requires the Equal Employment Opportunity Commission (EEOC) and the Office of Federal Contract Compliance Programs to train EEOC employees and affected individuals and entities on matters involving wage discrimination.

Authorizes the Secretary to make grants to eligible entities for negotiation skills training programs for girls and women. Directs the Secretary and the Secretary of Education to issue regulations or policy guidance to integrate such training into certain programs under their Departments.

Directs the Secretary to conduct studies and provide information to employers, labor organizations, and the general public regarding the means available to eliminate pay disparities between men and women.

Establishes the Secretary of Labor's National Award for Pay Equity in the Workplace for an employer who has made a substantial effort to eliminate pay disparities between men and women.

Amends the Civil Rights Act of 1964 to require the EEOC to collect from employers pay information data regarding the sex, race, and national origin of employees for use in the enforcement of federal laws prohibiting pay discrimination.

Directs: (1) the Commissioner of Labor Statistics to continue to collect data on woman workers in the Current Employment Statistics survey, (2) the Office of Federal Contract Compliance Programs to use specified types of methods in investigating compensation discrimination and in enforcing pay equity, and (3) the Secretary to make accurate information on compensation discrimination readily available to the public.

Directs the Secretary and the Commissioner [sic] of the EEOC jointly to develop technical assistance material to assist small businesses to comply with the requirements of this Act.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
01/23/2013 Introduced in Senate

All Actions (2)

Date
04/01/2014 Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. Hearings held.
Action By: Senate Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions
01/23/2013 Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Action By: Senate

Titles (2)

Short Titles:

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Introduced:

Paycheck Fairness Act

Official Titles:

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced:

A bill to amend the Fair Labor Standards Act of 1938 to provide more effective remedies to victims of discrimination in the payment of wages on the basis of sex, and for other purposes.


Subjects (11)

  • Civil actions and liability
  • Employment discrimination and employee rights
  • Government information and archives
  • Government studies and investigations
  • Public contracts and procurement
  • Racial and ethnic relations
  • Sex, gender, sexual orientation discrimination
  • Small business
  • Wages and earnings
  • Women's employment

Cosponsors (56)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA]* 01/23/2013
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD]* 01/23/2013
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE]* 01/23/2013
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL]* 01/23/2013
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY]* 01/23/2013
Sen. Hagan, Kay [D-NC]* 01/23/2013
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA]* 01/23/2013
Sen. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI]* 01/23/2013
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN]* 01/23/2013
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ]* 01/23/2013
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 01/23/2013
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI]* 01/23/2013
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO]* 01/23/2013
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR]* 01/23/2013
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA]* 01/23/2013
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI]* 01/23/2013
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT]* 01/23/2013
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH]* 01/23/2013
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI]* 01/23/2013
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM]* 01/23/2013
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI]* 01/23/2013
Sen. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM]* 01/23/2013
Sen. Udall, Mark [D-CO]* 01/23/2013
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR]* 01/23/2013
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA]* 01/23/2013
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN]* 01/23/2013
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK]* 01/23/2013
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 01/24/2013
Sen. Warren, Elizabeth [D-MA] 01/29/2013
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 01/29/2013
Sen. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT] 01/29/2013
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 01/30/2013
Sen. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI] 01/30/2013
Sen. Manchin, Joe, III [D-WV] 01/31/2013
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 02/04/2013
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 02/04/2013
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO] 02/07/2013
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] 02/07/2013
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 02/12/2013
Sen. Heitkamp, Heidi [D-ND] 02/12/2013
Sen. Cowan, William M. [D-MA] 02/12/2013
Sen. Kaine, Tim [D-VA] 03/07/2013
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 03/14/2013
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 04/10/2013
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 04/11/2013
Sen. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN] 04/15/2013
Sen. Warner, Mark R. [D-VA] 07/15/2013
Sen. Schatz, Brian [D-HI] 09/11/2013
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 09/17/2013
Sen. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA] 11/07/2013
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 01/30/2014
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 01/30/2014
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 03/25/2014
Sen. Booker, Cory A. [D-NJ] 03/27/2014
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 03/31/2014
Sen. Walsh, John E. [D-MT] 07/15/2014

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions01/23/2013 Referred to
04/01/2014 Hearings by

Related Bills (2)

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.