There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Caregivers Expansion and Improvement Act of 2013

Short Titles as Introduced

Caregivers Expansion and Improvement Act of 2013

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to amend title 38, United States Code, to extend to all veterans with a serious service-connected injury eligibility to participate in the family caregiver services program.


Actions Overview (2)

Date Actions Overview
09/17/2013Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Reported by Senator Sanders without amendment. With written report No. 113-107. Minority views filed.
04/25/2013Introduced in Senate

All Actions (6)

Date All Actions
09/17/2013Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 186.
Action By: Senate
09/17/2013Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Reported by Senator Sanders without amendment. With written report No. 113-107. Minority views filed.
07/24/2013Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
05/09/2013Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Hearings held. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 113-203.
04/25/2013Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. (text of measure as introduced: CR S3042)
Action By: Senate
04/25/2013Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S3042)
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (2)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA] 11/21/2013
Sen. Durbin, Richard J. [D-IL] 09/11/2014

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
Senate Veterans' Affairs04/25/2013 Referred to
05/09/2013 Hearings by
07/24/2013 Markup by
09/17/2013 Reported by S. Rept. 113-107

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for S.851. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to Senate without amendment (09/17/2013)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Caregivers Expansion and Improvement Act of 2013 - Extends to all veterans with a serious service-connected injury the eligibility to participate in the Department of Veterans Affairs (VA) program of comprehensive assistance to family caregivers of such veterans. (Under current law, such eligibility is limited to those veterans who incurred such an injury on or after September 11, 2001.)