Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Heitkamp, Heidi [D-ND]* 05/06/2013
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS]* 05/06/2013
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM]* 05/06/2013
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID]* 05/06/2013
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN]* 05/06/2013
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID]* 05/06/2013
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD]* 05/06/2013
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS]* 05/06/2013
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA]* 05/06/2013
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR]* 05/06/2013
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT]* 05/06/2013
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK]* 05/06/2013
Sen. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI]* 05/06/2013
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT]* 05/06/2013
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA]* 05/06/2013
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 06/03/2013
Sen. Schatz, Brian [D-HI] 12/17/2013
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 07/15/2014
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO] 12/01/2014
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 12/02/2014