Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Heller, Dean [R-NV]* 05/06/2013
Sen. Warner, Mark R. [D-VA]* 05/06/2013
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA]* 05/06/2013
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH]* 05/06/2013
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI]* 05/06/2013
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK]* 05/06/2013
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA]* 05/06/2013
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN]* 05/06/2013
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO] 05/07/2013
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 05/07/2013
Sen. Ayotte, Kelly [R-NH] 05/08/2013
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 05/09/2013
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 05/09/2013
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 05/09/2013
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 05/13/2013
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 05/13/2013
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] 05/13/2013
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 05/14/2013
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 05/15/2013
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 05/16/2013
Sen. Warren, Elizabeth [D-MA] 05/22/2013
Sen. King, Angus S. Jr. [I-ME] 06/11/2013
Sen. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT] 07/15/2013
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 07/24/2013
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 10/28/2013
Sen. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI] 10/28/2013
Sen. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA] 12/12/2013
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 01/30/2014
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 03/06/2014
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 05/01/2014
Sen. Booker, Cory A. [D-NJ] 05/12/2014
Sen. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL] 05/22/2014
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 05/22/2014
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 07/21/2014
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE] 07/24/2014
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 09/16/2014
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 11/17/2014