Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Ayotte, Kelly [R-NH]* 05/07/2013
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT]* 05/07/2013
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 05/08/2013
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 05/08/2013
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 05/09/2013
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 05/09/2013
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE] 05/09/2013
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 05/13/2013
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 05/13/2013
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 05/13/2013
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO] 05/14/2013
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 05/14/2013
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 05/15/2013
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 05/15/2013
Sen. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI] 05/15/2013
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 05/15/2013
Sen. Johanns, Mike [R-NE] 05/16/2013
Sen. King, Angus S. Jr. [I-ME] 05/16/2013
Sen. Schatz, Brian [D-HI] 05/16/2013
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 05/16/2013
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 05/20/2013
Sen. Portman, Rob [R-OH] 05/20/2013
Sen. Heitkamp, Heidi [D-ND] 05/20/2013
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 05/21/2013
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 05/21/2013
Sen. Warren, Elizabeth [D-MA] 05/22/2013
Sen. Udall, Mark [D-CO] 05/23/2013
Sen. Toomey, Pat [R-PA] 05/23/2013
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 05/23/2013
Sen. Heller, Dean [R-NV] 06/03/2013
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 06/03/2013
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 06/03/2013
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 06/03/2013
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 06/03/2013
Sen. Hagan, Kay [D-NC] 06/03/2013
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 06/04/2013
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 06/04/2013
Sen. Hoeven, John [R-ND] 07/10/2013