Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 05/07/2013
Sen. Warren, Elizabeth [D-MA]* 05/07/2013
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT]* 05/07/2013
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI]* 05/07/2013
Sen. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI]* 05/07/2013
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM]* 05/07/2013
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA]* 05/07/2013
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ]* 05/07/2013
Sen. Schatz, Brian [D-HI]* 05/07/2013
Sen. Heitkamp, Heidi [D-ND]* 05/07/2013
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH]* 05/07/2013
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA]* 05/07/2013
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR]* 05/07/2013
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ]* 05/07/2013
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 05/08/2013
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 06/03/2013
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 06/03/2013
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 06/21/2013
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE] 07/08/2013
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 07/18/2013
Sen. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI] 08/01/2013
Sen. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA] 12/11/2013
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 04/28/2014

Show cosponsors who withdrew