Refine your search

17 results for All Actions
Date Chamber All Actions
11/21/2013 Became Public Law No: 113-52.
11/21/2013 Signed by President.
11/14/2013 Senate Presented to President.
Action By: Senate
11/12/2013-5:51pm House On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H6971)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
Action By: House of Representatives
11/12/2013-5:41pm House DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 893.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
Action By: House of Representatives
11/12/2013-5:41pm House Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6971-6972)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
Action By: House of Representatives
11/12/2013-5:40pm House Mr. Miller (FL) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
Action By: House of Representatives
10/29/2013 House Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Type of Action: Introduction and Referral
Action By: House of Representatives
10/29/2013 Senate Message on Senate action sent to the House.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
Action By: Senate
10/29/2013-12:02pm House Received in the House.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
Action By: House of Representatives
10/28/2013 Senate Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7581; text as passed Senate: CR S7581)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
Action By: Senate
09/04/2013 Senate Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 165.
Type of Action: Calendars
Action By: Senate
09/04/2013 Senate Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Reported by Senator Sanders under authority of the order of the Senate of 08/01/2013 without amendment. With written report No. 113-87.
Type of Action: Committee Consideration
Action By: Senate Veterans' Affairs
07/24/2013 Senate Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
Type of Action: Committee Consideration
Action By: Senate Veterans' Affairs
06/12/2013 Senate Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Hearings held. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 113-111.
Type of Action: Committee Consideration
Action By: Senate Veterans' Affairs
05/08/2013 Senate Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. (text of measure as introduced: CR S3259)
Type of Action: Introduction and Referral
Action By: Senate
05/08/2013 Senate Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S3258-3259)
Type of Action: Introduction and Referral
Action By: Senate