Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA]* 05/08/2013
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 05/08/2013
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 05/21/2013
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] 06/24/2013
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 12/17/2013
Sen. Warren, Elizabeth [D-MA] 03/13/2014
Sen. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA] 06/03/2014