Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS]* 05/09/2013
Sen. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM]* 05/09/2013
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO] 06/11/2013
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 06/17/2013
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR] 06/19/2013
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 06/24/2013
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 06/26/2013
Sen. Warner, Mark R. [D-VA] 06/26/2013
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 06/26/2013
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 07/15/2013
Sen. King, Angus S. Jr. [I-ME] 07/15/2013
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 07/15/2013
Sen. Hagan, Kay [D-NC] 09/19/2013
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN] 11/18/2013
Sen. Booker, Cory A. [D-NJ] 07/08/2014