There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Introduced

Small Brewer Reinvestment and Expanding Workforce Act of 2013

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to provide a reduced rate of excise tax on beer produced domestically by certain qualifying producers.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
05/09/2013Introduced in Senate

All Actions (2)

Date
05/09/2013Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. (text of measure as introduced: CR S3332)
Action By: Senate
05/09/2013Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S3331-3332)
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (46)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 05/09/2013
Sen. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI]* 05/09/2013
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK]* 05/09/2013
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS]* 05/09/2013
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE]* 05/09/2013
Sen. Cowan, William M. [D-MA]* 05/09/2013
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ]* 05/09/2013
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR]* 05/09/2013
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD]* 05/09/2013
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT]* 05/09/2013
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 05/09/2013
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT]* 05/09/2013
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS]* 05/09/2013
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR]* 05/09/2013
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE]* 05/09/2013
Sen. Portman, Rob [R-OH]* 05/09/2013
Sen. King, Angus S., Jr. [I-ME]* 05/09/2013
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 05/13/2013
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] 05/13/2013
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO] 05/13/2013
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 05/15/2013
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS] 05/15/2013
Sen. Murphy, Christopher [D-CT] 05/15/2013
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 05/20/2013
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 05/22/2013
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 06/17/2013
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 06/17/2013
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 06/27/2013
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO] 07/15/2013
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR] 07/17/2013
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN] 08/01/2013
Sen. Warner, Mark R. [D-VA] 09/09/2013
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 11/12/2013
Sen. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI] 11/13/2013
Sen. Hagan, Kay R. [D-NC] 12/10/2013
Sen. Udall, Mark [D-CO] 12/19/2013
Sen. Ayotte, Kelly [R-NH] 02/24/2014
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 03/24/2014
Sen. Schatz, Brian [D-HI] 03/31/2014
Sen. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL] 04/10/2014
Sen. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM] 05/08/2014
Sen. Johanns, Mike [R-NE] 05/08/2014
Sen. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA] 05/12/2014
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 05/20/2014
Sen. Walsh, John E. [D-MT] 06/02/2014
Sen. Booker, Cory A. [D-NJ] 07/29/2014

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Finance05/09/2013 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.917. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (05/09/2013)

Small Brewer Reinvestment and Expanding Workforce Act of 2013 - Amends the Internal Revenue Code to reduce the rate of the excise tax on beer produced within or imported into the United States for brewers who produce not more than 6 million barrels of beer a year.