Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY]* 05/09/2013
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA]* 05/09/2013
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT]* 05/09/2013
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT]* 05/09/2013
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM]* 05/09/2013
Sen. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM]* 05/09/2013
Sen. Schatz, Brian [D-HI]* 05/09/2013
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR]* 05/09/2013
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID]* 05/09/2013
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 05/21/2013
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 01/16/2014
Sen. Warren, Elizabeth [D-MA] 02/26/2014
Sen. Walsh, John E. [D-MT] 06/11/2014