Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH]* 05/13/2013
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT]* 05/13/2013
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA]* 05/13/2013
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA] 05/16/2013
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 09/11/2013
Sen. Fischer, Deb [R-NE] 10/28/2013
Sen. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI] 10/28/2013
Sen. King, Angus S. Jr. [I-ME] 10/31/2013
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 07/07/2014
Sen. Ayotte, Kelly [R-NH] 11/18/2014