Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR]* 05/13/2013
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 10/10/2013
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS] 10/28/2013
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 10/29/2013
Sen. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM] 11/06/2013
Sen. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA] 12/09/2013
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO] 03/05/2014
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 06/02/2014
Sen. Toomey, Pat [R-PA] 08/05/2014