Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE]* 05/13/2013
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT]* 05/13/2013
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL]* 05/13/2013
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI]* 05/13/2013
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA]* 05/13/2013
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN]* 05/13/2013
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN] 07/29/2013
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 09/10/2013
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 11/05/2013
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 03/06/2014
Sen. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM] 03/06/2014
Sen. Booker, Cory A. [D-NJ] 03/10/2014
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 03/10/2014
Sen. Hagan, Kay [D-NC] 03/10/2014
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM] 03/10/2014
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 03/10/2014
Sen. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI] 03/11/2014
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 03/12/2014
Sen. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT] 03/13/2014
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 04/29/2014
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 05/05/2014
Sen. Heitkamp, Heidi [D-ND] 05/05/2014
Sen. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA] 05/05/2014
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 05/05/2014
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 05/05/2014
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 05/05/2014
Sen. Kaine, Tim [D-VA] 05/06/2014
Sen. Walsh, John E. [D-MT] 05/06/2014
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 05/06/2014
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 05/06/2014
Sen. Schatz, Brian [D-HI] 05/06/2014
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 05/06/2014
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 05/06/2014
Sen. Warren, Elizabeth [D-MA] 05/12/2014
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 07/30/2014
Sen. Warner, Mark R. [D-VA] 09/10/2014