Text: S.933 — 113th Congress (2013-2014)All Bill Information (Except Text)

Bill text available as:

Shown Here:
Reported to Senate (08/01/2013)

Calendar No. 162

113th CONGRESS
1st Session
S. 933

To amend title I of the Omnibus Crime Control and Safe Streets Act of 1968 to extend the authorization of the Bulletproof Vest Partnership Grant Program through fiscal year 2018.


IN THE SENATE OF THE UNITED STATES
May 13, 2013

Mr. Leahy (for himself, Mr. Coons, Mr. Blumenthal, Mr. Durbin, Mr. Whitehouse, Mrs. Feinstein, Ms. Klobuchar, and Mr. Franken) introduced the following bill; which was read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary

August 1, 2013

Reported by Mr. Leahy, without amendment


A BILL

To amend title I of the Omnibus Crime Control and Safe Streets Act of 1968 to extend the authorization of the Bulletproof Vest Partnership Grant Program through fiscal year 2018.

Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives of the United States of America in Congress assembled,

SECTION 1. Short title.

This Act may be cited as the “Bulletproof Vest Partnership Grant Program Reauthorization Act of 2013”.

SEC. 2. Extension of authorization of appropriations for Bulletproof Vest Partnership Grant Program.

Section 1001(a)(23) of title I of the Omnibus Crime Control and Safe Streets Act of 1968 (42 U.S.C. 3793(a)(23)) is amended by striking “part Y,” and all that follows and inserting the following: “part Y—

“(A) $15,000,000 for each of fiscal years 2014 and 2015; and

“(B) $30,000,000 for each of fiscal years 2016, 2017, and 2018.”.

SEC. 3. Expiration of previously appropriated funds.

Section 2501 of title I of the Omnibus Crime Control and Safe Streets Act of 1968 (42 U.S.C. 3796ll) is amended by adding at the end the following:

“(h) Expiration of previously appropriated funds.—

“(1) DEFINITION.—In this subsection, the term ‘previously appropriated funds’ means any amounts that—

“(A) were appropriated for any of fiscal years 1999 through 2012 to carry out this part; and

“(B) on the date of enactment of the Bulletproof Vest Partnership Grant Program Reauthorization Act of 2013, are available to be expended and have not been expended, including funds that were previously obligated but undisbursed.

“(2) EXPIRATION.—All previously appropriated funds that are not expended by September 30, 2015 shall be transferred to the General Fund of the Treasury not later than January 15, 2016.”.

SEC. 4. Sense of Congress on 2-year limitation on funds.

It is the sense of Congress that amounts made available to carry out part Y of title I of the Omnibus Crime Control and Safe Streets Act of 1968 (42 U.S.C. 3796ll et seq.) should be made available through the end of the first fiscal year following the fiscal year for which the amounts are appropriated and should not be made available until expended.

SEC. 5. Matching funds limitation.

Section 2501(f) of title I of the Omnibus Crime Control and Safe Streets Act of 1968 (42 U.S.C. 3796ll(f)) is amended—

(1) by redesignating paragraph (3) as paragraph (4); and

(2) by inserting after paragraph (2) the following:

“(3) LIMITATION ON STATE MATCHING FUNDS.—A State, unit of local government, or Indian tribe may not use funding received under any other Federal grant program to pay or defer the cost, in whole or in part, of the matching requirement under paragraph (1).”.

SEC. 6. Application of Bulletproof Vest Partnership Grant Program requirements to any armor vest or body armor purchased with Federal grant funds.

Section 521 of title I of the Omnibus Crime Control and Safe Streets Act of 1968 (42 U.S.C. 3766a) is amended by adding at the end the following:

“(c)(1) Notwithstanding any other provision of law, a grantee that uses funds made available under this part to purchase an armor vest or body armor shall—

“(A) comply with any requirements established for the use of grants made under part Y;

“(B) have a written policy requiring uniformed patrol officers to wear an armor vest or body armor; and

“(C) use the funds to purchase armor vests or body armor that meet any performance standards established by the Director of the Bureau of Justice Assistance.

“(2) In this subsection, the terms ‘armor vest’ and ‘body armor’ have the same meanings given the terms in section 2503.”.

SEC. 7. Uniquely fitted armor vests.

Section 2501(c) of title I of the Omnibus Crime Control and Safe Streets Act of 1968 (42 U.S.C. 3796ll(c)) is amended—

(1) in paragraph (2), by striking “and” at the end;

(2) in paragraph (3), by striking “; or” and inserting “; and”;

(3) by redesignating paragraph (4) as paragraph (5); and

(4) by inserting after paragraph (3) the following:

“(4) provides armor vests to law enforcement officers that are uniquely fitted for such officers, including vests uniquely fitted to individual female law enforcement officers; or”.


Calendar No. 162

113th CONGRESS
     1st Session
S. 933

A BILL
To amend title I of the Omnibus Crime Control and Safe Streets Act of 1968 to extend the authorization of the Bulletproof Vest Partnership Grant Program through fiscal year 2018.

August 1, 2013
Reported without amendment