Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Heller, Dean [R-NV]* 05/14/2013
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA]* 05/14/2013
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK]* 05/14/2013
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS]* 05/14/2013
Sen. Johnson, Ron [R-WI]* 05/14/2013
Sen. Fischer, Deb [R-NE]* 05/14/2013
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID]* 05/14/2013
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN]* 05/14/2013
Sen. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL]* 05/14/2013
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA]* 05/14/2013
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL]* 05/14/2013
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 05/15/2013
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR] 05/20/2013
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC] 05/23/2013
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 06/12/2013