Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 05/14/2013
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK]* 05/14/2013
Sen. Hagan, Kay [D-NC]* 05/14/2013
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN]* 05/14/2013
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 05/16/2013
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 05/20/2013
Sen. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN] 06/11/2013
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 07/23/2013
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 10/29/2013
Sen. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL] 03/31/2014
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 04/01/2014
Sen. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA] 07/08/2014