Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY]* 05/14/2013
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO]* 05/14/2013
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR]* 05/14/2013
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC]* 05/14/2013
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN]* 05/14/2013
Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK]* 05/14/2013
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS]* 05/14/2013
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX]* 05/14/2013
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY]* 05/14/2013
Sen. Fischer, Deb [R-NE]* 05/14/2013
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC]* 05/14/2013
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA]* 05/14/2013
Sen. Johanns, Mike [R-NE]* 05/14/2013
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS]* 05/14/2013
Sen. Paul, Rand [R-KY]* 05/14/2013
Sen. Portman, Rob [R-OH]* 05/14/2013
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS]* 05/14/2013
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD]* 05/14/2013
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA]* 05/14/2013
Sen. Lee, Mike [R-UT]* 05/14/2013
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL]* 05/14/2013
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 05/21/2013
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 05/21/2013
Sen. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ] 01/09/2014
Sen. Scott, Tim [R-SC] 01/27/2014
Sen. Toomey, Pat [R-PA] 02/06/2014
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 09/17/2014