There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

SAFE Act Confidentiality and Privilege Enhancement Act

Short Titles as Introduced

SAFE Act Confidentiality and Privilege Enhancement Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to ensure access to certain information for financial services industry regulators, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
12/17/2013Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(text: CR S8917)
12/17/2013Senate Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S8817)
05/14/2013Introduced in Senate

All Actions (6)

Date Chamber All Actions
12/19/2013HouseReferred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
12/19/2013-11:02amHouseReceived in the House.
12/18/2013SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
12/17/2013SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S8917)
12/17/2013SenateSenate Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S8817)
05/14/2013SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.

Cosponsors (7)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Toomey, Pat [R-PA]* 05/14/2013
Sen. Manchin, Joe, III [D-WV]* 05/14/2013
Sen. Johanns, Mike [R-NE]* 05/14/2013
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 05/15/2013
Sen. Heitkamp, Heidi [D-ND] 06/13/2013
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 12/11/2013
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 12/11/2013

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs05/14/2013 Referred to
12/17/2013 Discharged from
House Financial Services12/19/2013 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for S.947. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate without amendment (12/17/2013)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

SAFE Act Confidentiality and Privilege Enhancement Act - Amends the S.A.F.E. Mortgage Licensing Act of 2008 to extend to state and federal regulatory officials having financial services oversight authority (currently only those having mortgage oversight authority) access to any information provided to the Nationwide Mortgage Licensing System and Registry (or any system established by the Director of the Consumer Financial Protection Bureau [CFPB]) without the loss of privilege or confidentiality protections provided by federal and state laws.