Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS]* 05/14/2013
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 05/23/2013
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 09/12/2013
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 09/12/2013
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 09/23/2013
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 12/10/2013
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 01/15/2014
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 03/12/2014
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA] 03/24/2014
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 03/27/2014
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 04/02/2014
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO] 05/05/2014
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 05/15/2014
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 05/21/2014
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO] 06/23/2014
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO] 06/26/2014
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 07/07/2014
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] 07/28/2014
Sen. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT] 07/31/2014
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 09/08/2014
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE] 11/12/2014