Refine your search

Showing 4 of 4 total for Major Actions.
Date Major Actions
09/04/2013 By Senator Stabenow from Committee on Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry filed written report under authority of the order of the Senate of 08/01/2013. Report No. 113-88. Additional views filed.
06/10/2013 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with amendments by Yea-Nay Vote. 66 - 27. Record Vote Number: 145.(text: CR 6/11/2013 S4232-4349)
05/14/2013 Committee on Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry. Original measure reported to Senate by Senator Stabenow. Without written report.
05/14/2013 Introduced in Senate