Refine your search

59 results for All Actions
Date Chamber All Actions
09/04/2013 Senate By Senator Stabenow from Committee on Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry filed written report under authority of the order of the Senate of 08/01/2013. Report No. 113-88. Additional views filed.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
07/18/2013 Senate See also H.R. 2642.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
07/18/2013 Senate Senate incorporated this measure in H.R.2642 as an amendment.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
06/12/2013 Senate Senate ordered measure printed as passed.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
06/11/2013-5:24pm House Held at the desk.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
06/11/2013-5:05pm House Received in the House.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
06/11/2013 Senate Message on Senate action sent to the House.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
06/10/2013 Senate Passed Senate with amendments by Yea-Nay Vote. 66 - 27. Record Vote Number: 145. (text: CR 6/11/2013 S4232-4349)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
06/10/2013 Senate S.Amdt.998 Amendment SA 998 agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 48 - 38. Record Vote Number: 144.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
06/10/2013 Senate S.Amdt.998 Considered by Senate. (consideration: CR S4043, S4051)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
06/10/2013 Senate Considered by Senate. (consideration: CR S4043-4053)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
06/06/2013 Senate Cloture invoked in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 75 - 22. Record Vote Number: 141. (consideration: CR S3976; text: CR S3976)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
06/06/2013 Senate S.Amdt.998 Considered by Senate. (consideration: CR S3971)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
06/06/2013 Senate Considered by Senate. (consideration: CR S3971-3976)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
06/04/2013 Senate Cloture motion on the measure presented in Senate. (consideration: CR S3949; text: CR S3949)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
06/04/2013 Senate S.Amdt.998 Considered by Senate. (consideration: CR S3924)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
06/04/2013 Senate Considered by Senate. (consideration: CR S3923-3926, S3927-3949)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
06/03/2013 Senate S.Amdt.1079 Amendment SA 1079 agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
06/03/2013 Senate S.Amdt.1079 Amendment SA 1079 proposed by Senator Stabenow for Senator Coons. (consideration: CR S3901; text: CR S3901)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
06/03/2013 Senate S.Amdt.987 Amendment SA 987 agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 72 - 18. Record Vote Number: 140.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
06/03/2013 Senate S.Amdt.987 Amendment SA 987 proposed by Senator Moran. (consideration: CR S3900-3901; text: CR S3900)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
06/03/2013 Senate S.Amdt.998 Considered by Senate. (consideration: CR S3895)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
06/03/2013 Senate Considered by Senate. (consideration: CR S3895-3902)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
05/23/2013 Senate S.Amdt.953 Amendment SA 953 agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 59 - 33. Record Vote Number: 139.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
05/23/2013 Senate S.Amdt.1031 Amendment SA 1031 agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 94 - 0. Record Vote Number: 138.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
05/23/2013 Senate S.Amdt.953 Amendment SA 953 proposed by Senator Durbin. (consideration: CR S3817-3819, S3820; text: CR S3819)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
05/23/2013 Senate S.Amdt.1031 Amendment SA 1031 proposed by Senator Hagan. (consideration: CR S3817, S3819-3820; text: CR S3817)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
05/23/2013 Senate S.Amdt.923 Amendment SA 923, under the order of 5/23/13, not having achieved 60 votes in the affirmative, was not agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 44 - 52. Record Vote Number: 137.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
05/23/2013 Senate S.Amdt.923 Amendment SA 923 proposed by Senator Feinstein. (consideration: CR S3805-3809, S3816-3817; text: CR S3805)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
05/23/2013 Senate S.Amdt.965 Amendment SA 965, under the order of 5/22/13, not having achieved 60 votes in the affirmative, was not agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 27 - 71. Record Vote Number: 135.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
05/23/2013 Senate S.Amdt.965 Considered by Senate. (consideration: CR S3797)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
05/23/2013 Senate S.Amdt.998 Considered by Senate. (consideration: CR S3797)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
05/23/2013 Senate Considered by Senate. (consideration: CR S3797-3809, S3816-3826)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
05/22/2013 Senate S.Amdt.965 Amendment SA 965 proposed by Senator Sanders. (consideration: CR S3749-3752 ; text: CR S3749-3750)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
05/22/2013 Senate S.Amdt.925 Amendment SA 925 not agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 45 - 54. Record Vote Number: 134.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
05/22/2013 Senate S.Amdt.925 Amendment SA 925 proposed by Senator Stabenow for Senator Shaheen. (consideration: CR S3727-3728, S3734-3736, S3745-3746; text: CR S3727-3728)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
05/22/2013 Senate S.Amdt.1056 Amendment SA 1056 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
05/22/2013 Senate S.Amdt.992 Amendment SA 992 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
05/22/2013 Senate S.Amdt.1056 Amendment SA 1056 proposed by Senator Stabenow for Senator Vitter. (consideration: CR S3716-3717; text: CR S3717)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
05/22/2013 Senate S.Amdt.992 Amendment SA 992 proposed by Senator Stabenow for Senator Franken. (consideration: CR S3716-3717; text; CR S3716-3717)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
05/22/2013 Senate S.Amdt.960 Amendment SA 960 not agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 36 - 60. Record Vote Number: 132.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
05/22/2013 Senate S.Amdt.960 Amendment SA 960 proposed by Senator Inhofe. (consideration: CR S3712-3716; text: CR S3713-3714)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
05/22/2013 Senate S.Amdt.998 Considered by Senate. (consideration: CR S3712)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
05/22/2013 Senate Considered by Senate. (consideration: CR S3712-3736, S3745-3752)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
05/21/2013 Senate S.Amdt.998 Amendment SA 998 proposed by Senator Stabenow for Senator Leahy. (consideration: CR S3652)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
05/21/2013 Senate S.Amdt.931 Amendment SA 931 not agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 26 - 70. Record Vote Number: 131.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
05/21/2013 Senate S.Amdt.948 Amendment SA 948 not agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 40 - 58. Record Vote Number: 130.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
05/21/2013 Senate S.Amdt.948 Amendment SA 948 proposed by Senator Roberts. (consideration: CR S3641-3647; text: CR S3641-3642)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
05/21/2013 Senate S.Amdt.945 Amendment SA 945 as modified agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent. (text as modified: CR S3637)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
05/21/2013 Senate S.Amdt.945 Amendment SA 945 proposed by Senator Stabenow for Senator Sessions. (consideration: CR S3637)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
05/21/2013 Senate S.Amdt.931 Amendment SA 931 proposed by Senator Gillibrand. (consideration: CR S3636-3637, S3637, S3647-3648; text: CR S3636-3637)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
05/21/2013 Senate S.Amdt.919 Amendment SA 919 agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 87 - 8. Record Vote Number: 129.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
05/21/2013 Senate S.Amdt.919 Considered by Senate. (consideration: CR S3634, S3636)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
05/21/2013 Senate Considered by Senate. (consideration: CR S3634-3637, S3637-3648, S3652)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
05/20/2013 Senate S.Amdt.919 Amendment SA 919 proposed by Senator Stabenow for Senator Cantwell. (consideration: CR S3592; text: CR S3592)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
05/20/2013 Senate Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S3591-3595, S3597)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
05/15/2013 Senate Motion to proceed to consideration of measure made in Senate. (consideration: CR S3519-3525)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
05/14/2013 Senate Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 73.
Type of Action: Calendars
05/14/2013 Senate Committee on Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry. Original measure reported to Senate by Senator Stabenow. Without written report.
Type of Action: Committee Consideration
Action By: Senate Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry