Limit your search

1-25 of 118
  1. S.Amdt.1180 to S.Amdt.1122   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Sponsor: Sen. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN] (Submitted 06/06/2013)
  2. S.Amdt.1178 to S.Amdt.1171   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Sponsor: Sen. Schatz, Brian [D-HI] (Submitted 06/06/2013)
  3. S.Amdt.1177   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Sponsor: Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] (Submitted 06/06/2013)
  4. S.Amdt.1176   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Sponsor: Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] (Submitted 06/06/2013)
  5. S.Amdt.1175   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Sponsor: Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] (Submitted 06/06/2013)
  6. S.Amdt.1173   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Sponsor: Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] (Submitted 06/05/2013)
  7. S.Amdt.1172   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Sponsor: Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] (Submitted 06/05/2013)
  8. S.Amdt.1171   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Sponsor: Sen. Schatz, Brian [D-HI] (Submitted 06/05/2013)
  9. S.Amdt.1168   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Sponsor: Sen. Udall, Mark [D-CO] (Submitted 06/05/2013)
  10. S.Amdt.1167   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Sponsor: Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] (Submitted 06/05/2013)
  11. S.Amdt.1164   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Sponsor: Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] (Submitted 06/05/2013)
  12. S.Amdt.1161   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Sponsor: Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] (Submitted 06/04/2013)
  13. S.Amdt.1160   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Sponsor: Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] (Submitted 06/04/2013)
  14. S.Amdt.1159   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Sponsor: Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] (Submitted 06/04/2013)
  15. S.Amdt.1157   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Sponsor: Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] (Submitted 06/04/2013)
  16. S.Amdt.1155   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Sponsor: Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN] (Submitted 06/03/2013)
  17. S.Amdt.1153   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Sponsor: Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] (Submitted 06/03/2013)
  18. S.Amdt.1150   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Sponsor: Sen. Schatz, Brian [D-HI] (Submitted 06/03/2013)
  19. S.Amdt.1149   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Sponsor: Sen. Schatz, Brian [D-HI] (Submitted 06/03/2013)
  20. S.Amdt.1148   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Sponsor: Sen. Cowan, William M. [D-MA] (Submitted 06/03/2013)
  21. S.Amdt.1147   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Sponsor: Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] (Submitted 06/03/2013)
  22. S.Amdt.1146   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Sponsor: Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO] (Submitted 06/03/2013)
  23. S.Amdt.1145   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Sponsor: Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] (Submitted 06/03/2013)
  24. S.Amdt.1132   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Sponsor: Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] (Submitted 05/23/2013)
  25. S.Amdt.1130   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Sponsor: Sen. Manchin, Joe, III [D-WV] (Submitted 05/23/2013)