Limit your search

1-25 of 127
  1. S.Amdt.1179 to S.Amdt.1051   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Sponsor: Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] (Submitted 06/06/2013)
  2. S.Amdt.1174 to S.Amdt.956   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Sponsor: Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] (Submitted 06/06/2013)
  3. S.Amdt.1170   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Sponsor: Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] (Submitted 06/05/2013)
  4. S.Amdt.1169   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Sponsor: Sen. Fischer, Deb [R-NE] (Submitted 06/05/2013)
  5. S.Amdt.1166   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Sponsor: Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] (Submitted 06/05/2013)
  6. S.Amdt.1165   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Sponsor: Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] (Submitted 06/05/2013)
  7. S.Amdt.1163   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Sponsor: Sen. Hoeven, John [R-ND] (Submitted 06/04/2013)
  8. S.Amdt.1162   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Sponsor: Sen. Johanns, Mike [R-NE] (Submitted 06/04/2013)
  9. S.Amdt.1158   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Sponsor: Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR] (Submitted 06/04/2013)
  10. S.Amdt.1156   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Sponsor: Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] (Submitted 06/04/2013)
  11. S.Amdt.1152   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Sponsor: Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] (Submitted 06/03/2013)
  12. S.Amdt.1151   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Sponsor: Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] (Submitted 06/03/2013)
  13. S.Amdt.1144   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Sponsor: Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS] (Submitted 06/03/2013)
  14. S.Amdt.1142   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Sponsor: Sen. Hoeven, John [R-ND] (Submitted 05/23/2013)
  15. S.Amdt.1141   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Sponsor: Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] (Submitted 05/23/2013)
  16. S.Amdt.1140   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Sponsor: Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] (Submitted 05/23/2013)
  17. S.Amdt.1139   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Sponsor: Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] (Submitted 05/23/2013)
  18. S.Amdt.1138   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Sponsor: Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] (Submitted 05/23/2013)
  19. S.Amdt.1137   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Sponsor: Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] (Submitted 05/23/2013)
  20. S.Amdt.1136   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Sponsor: Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] (Submitted 05/23/2013)
  21. S.Amdt.1135   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Sponsor: Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] (Submitted 05/23/2013)
  22. S.Amdt.1134   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Sponsor: Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] (Submitted 05/23/2013)
  23. S.Amdt.1133   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Sponsor: Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] (Submitted 05/23/2013)
  24. S.Amdt.1129   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Sponsor: Sen. Hoeven, John [R-ND] (Submitted 05/23/2013)
  25. S.Amdt.1128   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Sponsor: Sen. Hoeven, John [R-ND] (Submitted 05/23/2013)