Limit your search

1-6 of 6
  1. S.Amdt.1166   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] (Submitted 06/05/2013)
    Cosponsors: 3
  2. S.Amdt.1118   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] (Submitted 05/23/2013)
    Cosponsors: 14
  3. S.Amdt.1115   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] (Submitted 05/22/2013)
    Cosponsors: 3
  4. S.Amdt.1088   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] (Submitted 05/22/2013)
    Cosponsors: 11
  5. S.Amdt.943   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] (Submitted 05/20/2013)
    Cosponsors: 2
  6. S.Amdt.931   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: To strike a reduction in the supplemental nutrition assistance program, with an offset that limits crop insurance reimbursements to providers.
    Sponsor: Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] (Submitted 05/20/2013) (Proposed 05/21/2013)
    Cosponsors: 19
    Latest Action: 05/21/13 Amendment SA 931 not agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 26 - 70. Record Vote Number: 131.